Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF YESHIVAT SHEFA

Charity number: 292010
Charity reporting is overdue by 427 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 62 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 62 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 427 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 427 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 December 2020 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window