THE MASONS COMPANY CRAFT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is to promote any charitable purpose, which will: a) encourage the exercise and maintain the standards of the craft of stonemasonry b) preserve and improve the craft of stonemasonry c) foster, promote and increase the interest of the public in the craft of stonemasonry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Howard Fox | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Jon Hammond | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Russell James Paul Taylor | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Paul Kraven | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clive Merry | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.10k | £181.61k | £121.70k | £102.92k | £99.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.70k | £104.48k | £112.12k | £89.92k | £99.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH MAY 1985
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL (A) ENCOURAGE THE EXERCISE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF THE CRAFT OF STONEMASONRY; (B) PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE CRAFT OF STONEMASONRY; OR (C) FOSTER PROMOTE AND INCREASE THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT OF STONEMASONRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Fredrick's Place
London
EC2R 8AB
- Phone:
- 02074897834
- Email:
- craftfund@masonslivery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window