CAMBODIAN SOCIETY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society is established to advance the education of the public in the United Kingdom about any aspects of Cambodia, including its people, history, culture and traditions. The main events, organised by CASUNIK, are the Cambodian New Year in Mid April, the Pchum Ben (Remembrance) Ceremony in September/October (also election date of the new Executive Committee Members) and Xmas Party.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Cambodia
Governance
- 02 July 1985: Standard registration
- CASUNIK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOBOPHA OWEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHEA TAN | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
USALY TAN | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656 | £1.66k | £3.84k | £3.23k | £5.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £705 | £1.27k | £2.51k | £3.35k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1981 AND AMENDED 26TH MAY 1985
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE U.K. ABOUT ANY ASPECT OF CAMBODIA, INCLUDING ITS PEOPLE, HISTORY, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS. II. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ANY PERSONS OF CAMBODIAN ORIGIN IN THE U.K. WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINFIELD
4 CURTIS CLOSE
HEADLEY
BORDON
GU35 8PB
- Phone:
- 07887506867
- Email:
- info@casunik.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window