Accounts and annual returns THE STUART ROSSITER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 292076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window