Accounts and annual returns Friends of Robert Barclay academy

Charity number: 292090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 April 2021 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 October 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required