ARAB WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 292272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

AWA's objective is fund raising and collecting for the relief of poverty & distress amongst children, women and families from the Middle East living in the region or elsewhere, including the UK. Funds are raised by arranging various activities such as lunches, dinners, cultural events, etc. The aim is to promote educational, social, economic, and health opportunities for those in greatest need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £620

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Lebanon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
May Achour Trustee 30 October 2017
None on record
Dana Dalloul Trustee 30 October 2017
None on record
Rula Abu Khadra Trustee 30 October 2017
None on record
Jawan Toukan Trustee 30 October 2017
None on record
KHALIDA HABBAS Trustee
None on record
MAHA FREIJ Trustee
None on record
HAYA NASiR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.41k £6.50k £606 £0 £0
Total expenditure £15.72k £11.03k £502 £556 £620
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 October 2024 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2024 707 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2022 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Suite 234
28 Old Brompton Road
LONDON
SW7 3SS
Phone:
02077233535
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available