Accounts and annual returns THE ST GREGORY'S COLLEGE TRUST
Charity number: 292274

Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 341 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 341 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 706 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 706 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1071 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1071 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1437 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1437 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1802 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Overdue | Overdue by 1802 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window