Trustees THE OXFORD AND CAMBRIDGE ROWING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 292325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonny Searle Chair 12 October 2020
None on record
Hannah Roberts Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Erin Kennedy Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Richard Jackson Trustee 12 April 2018
None on record
Chris Le Neve Foster Trustee 12 April 2018
None on record
David Finn Trustee 12 April 2018
None on record
Krystyna Nowak Trustee 12 April 2018
None on record
Fiona Morrison Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record
Alderman Sir David Hugh Wootton Trustee 16 September 2014
MORDEN COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE JESUS COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES DICKENS CENTRE (GAD'S HILL) LIMITED
Received: On time
CROSS SECTOR SAFETY AND SECURITY COMMUNICATIONS
Received: On time
THE WOOLMEN'S COMPANY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
BOWYERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Tom Barry Trustee 16 September 2014
None on record