SOUTH EASTERN SHIRE HORSE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness of the Heavy Horse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BOWER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Thomas Stamp | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Malcolm Bundock | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Roy Turner | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Clive Turner | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Noble | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hana Tisdall-Mitchell | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Hicks | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara-Jane Mumford | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Neighbour | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Roper | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Langley | Trustee | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Molly Langley | Trustee | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £21.87k | £41.00k | £26.23k | £978 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.42k | £15.87k | £22.87k | £36.48k | £3.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 26TH JULY 1985
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE BREED AND PROMOTE THE BREEDING OF SHIRE HORSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southwood Farm
Buckhurst Road
WESTERHAM
Kent
TN16 2HR
- Phone:
- 07982819398
- Email:
- info@sesha.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window