Accounts and annual returns THE E A C EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 292391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 06 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window