Financial history THE E A C EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 292391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £42.58k £23.79k £17.54k £14.03k £10.76k
Total expenditure £51.92k £46.94k £46.76k £47.60k £77.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A