Financial history THE DUTCH COTTAGE

Charity number: 292419
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.93k £5.29k £5.46k £5.28k £5.43k
Total expenditure £5.17k £1.20k £2.23k £6.44k £1.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A