Governing document CARE INTERNATIONAL UK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/05/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/08/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG THE WORLD'S POOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.