Trustees CARE INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 292506
Charity reporting is up to date (156 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lyndall Norma Stein Chair 01 August 2022
BRITISH REFUGEE COUNCIL
Received: On time
Sribavan SRISATHKURUNATHAN Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Desiree D'Souza Trustee 02 March 2021
None on record
Anita Yuen Trustee 02 March 2021
None on record
Khalid El Ansari Trustee 25 March 2020
None on record
Edward Sparrow Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Esther Kwaku Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
NADINE NOHR Trustee 07 December 2016
None on record
NIGEL Conrad CHAPMAN Trustee 07 December 2016
None on record