WESTBROOK HAY EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 292537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.63m £3.76m £3.98m £4.17m £3.97m
Total expenditure £3.08m £3.28m £3.47m £3.74m £3.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £42.20k £12.01k £1.40k £2.70k £68.50k
Income - Other trading activities £34.46k £0 £36.19k £0 £13.93k
Income - Charitable activities £3.55m £3.75m £3.94m £4.14m £3.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.94k £2.95k £2.45k £5.41k £2.13k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £12.01k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.07m £3.28m £3.47m £3.74m £3.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.62k £13.64k £13.51k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0