WESTBROOK HAY EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 292537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Grant Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
STEPHEN HAMPSTEAD Trustee None on record
Katherine Emma Berrill Trustee 05 March 2019 None on record
ANDREW MCKENZIE NEWLAND Trustee 08 February 2012 None on record
Victoria Corfield Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record
Matthew O'Donnell Trustee 08 March 2018 None on record
DIANA ELIZABETH DEBORAH ROBINSON Trustee 13 October 2015 None on record
Lucy Jane Wood Trustee 05 March 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIAISTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, CHIPPERFIELD Received: On time