TAVISTOCK CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 292538
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 1985 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN TAVISTOCK AND BEYOND.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 30 August 1985 : registered
  • 09 October 2010 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
  • 08 November 2011 : re-registered
  • 30 April 2013 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information