1ST OTTERY ST MARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 292603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 October 2017 On time Download