1ST OTTERY ST MARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 292603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.63k £47.36k £41.78k £31.63k £31.84k
Total expenditure £32.82k £24.71k £36.02k £44.85k £38.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A