Accounts and annual returns ST BENEDICTS TRUST

Charity number: 292710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 July 2019 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required