Financial history THE BRITISH COMPUTER SOCIETY

Charity number: 292786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £35.11m £19.88m £20.92m £22.00m £22.33m
Total expenditure £36.46m £23.59m £21.07m £21.72m £21.48m
Income from government contracts £250.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.56m £1.52m £931.00k £1.12m £131.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £34.75m £19.51m £20.33m £21.21m £21.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.00k £18.00k £54.00k £69.00k £51.00k
Income - Other £361.00k £354.00k £528.00k £724.00k £1.18m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £36.46m £23.59m £21.07m £21.72m £21.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £452.00k £681.00k £789.00k £709.00k £707.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0