Trustees THE BRITISH COMPUTER SOCIETY

Charity number: 292786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mayank Prakash Chair 10 March 2021
None on record
Paul Martynenko Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Professor James Harold Davenport Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Dr Yuri Vershinin Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Hugh Greenway Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Sharon Anne Moore MBE Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Dr Colin Smythe Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
John Stuart Higgins CBE Trustee 11 March 2020
THE MUSEUM OF EAST ASIAN ART
Received: On time
Professor Alastair David Irons Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Dr Kuruneruge Samitha Sujith De Silva Trustee 09 May 2019
INTEGRITY ACTION
Received: On time
Dr Benjamin Keith Willoughby Booth Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
Alastair James Carlton Revell Trustee 14 March 2018
THE INSTITUTION OF ANALYSTS & PROGRAMMERS
Received: On time
Dr Indranil Nath Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
GILLIAN ARNOLD Trustee 09 March 2016
None on record