BUCKINGHAM OLD GAOL TRUST

Charity number: 292807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Restoration and maintenance of 'The Old Gaol' Buckingham and its development as a heritage centre museum and source of education for the benefit of the people of Buckingham and Bucks.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £31,294
Total expenditure: £31,155

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BUCKINGHAM HERITAGE TRUST (Previous name)
  • BUCKINGHAM HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bryony Norburn Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
Joanne Margaret Thompson Trustee 07 October 2021
None on record
David Royston Bethell Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Terence Henry Bloomfield Trustee 08 October 2020
BUCKINGHAM COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Kim Lesley Whitbread Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Michael Neville Wisbach Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
DAVID FELL MA MIFA Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.04k £29.66k £35.49k £67.89k £31.29k
Total expenditure £47.27k £30.37k £23.39k £70.42k £31.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £0 £3.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD GAOL
MARKET HILL
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 1JX
Phone:
01280823020