Financial history THE VICTORIA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 292841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £401.10k £16.93m £18.72m £25.35m £25.82m
Total expenditure £338.61k £18.43m £20.96m £21.78m £25.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.89m £2.25m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £198.00k £270.00k £63.00k £632.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £16.70m £18.41m £25.24m £25.15m
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £34.00k £37.00k £39.00k £33.00k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £600.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £788.00k £1.07m £927.00k £24.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £208.00k £96.00k £6.00k £33.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £633.00k £732.00k £843.00k £986.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £112.72k £179.00k £30.00k £56.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £17.43m £19.79m £20.84m £1.20m