THE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 292880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time Download