Financial history THE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 292880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £29.79m £32.47m £33.81m £29.27m £38.96m
Total expenditure £30.79m £32.26m £33.90m £30.44m £40.57m
Income from government contracts £12.23m £13.94m £15.53m £15.02m £14.61m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £183.28k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.72k £3.69k £539 £8.14k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £29.38m £31.93m £33.53m £28.90m £38.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £406.59k £542.64k £279.44k £94.78k £77.53k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £263.95k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.69m £32.18m £33.86m £30.33m £40.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £80.73k £77.86k £37.77k £119.58k £365.34k
Expenditure - Governance £83.25k £113.59k £96.47k £51.73k £64.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £562.80k £583.36k £391.61k £181.72k £43.16k
Expenditure - Investment management £80.73k £65.98k £37.77k £0 £18.09k
Expenditure - Other £16.11k £0 £368 £0 £0