Governing document THE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.