THE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 292880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GLEN VON MALACHOWSKI Trustee 20 April 2016
VINCENTIAN CARE PLUS Received: On time
DYLAN JONES Trustee 04 March 2013 None on record
MR NICK STEPHENS DL FCA Trustee None on record
JOHN RICHARD QUENTIN FOLLIOTT VAUGHAN Chair None on record
Dr Lila Dinner Trustee 07 June 2021 None on record
Nigel Draper Trustee 16 September 2015 None on record
Lynne Roberts Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
Dr Chris Streather Trustee 11 July 2018
THE ROYAL FREE CHARITY Received: On time
Mark Gerold Trustee 16 September 2015 None on record