RICHMOND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 292907
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.29k £14.46k £10.58k £9.67k £10.14k
Total expenditure £11.08k £7.11k £11.75k £10.12k £10.90k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A