RICHMOND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 292907
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Velluet Trustee 01 January 1985 None on record
ROBERT JAMES ARMSTRONG SMITH Chair 28 May 2013 None on record
Dr Simon Targett Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
SIMON FOWLER Trustee 11 July 2012 None on record
SHIRLEY JANE NEWTON Trustee 15 May 2017
THE KEWI WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
SHIRLEY ANNE CLARK Trustee 15 July 2020
THE KEWI WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Robert Jack Elson Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
Jill Amy Nefertiti Lamb Trustee 20 May 2019
FRIENDS OF KINGSTON MUSEUM AND HERITAGE Received: On time
ROSE AYLMER CONSTANTINE Trustee 15 May 2017 None on record