BARNES AND MORTLAKE HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 292918
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Olizar Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
Jane Edwards Trustee 16 March 2006 None on record
PAUL LEONARD RAWKINS Chair None on record
Marion Earle Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
Linda Janet Andrew Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
ANN BREEZE Trustee 17 July 2011 None on record
DAVID RALPH DEATON Trustee None on record
Peter Charles Hayward Trustee 28 August 2014 None on record
Lucy Handscomb Trustee 19 March 2015 None on record
ISABEL JAMSON Trustee None on record