Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF OROT

Charity number: 292955
Charity reporting is overdue by 854 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 124 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 489 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 489 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 854 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 854 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 December 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 February 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required