Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF RADWINTER CHURCH

Charity number: 293049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2021 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required