Trustees THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ENGINEERING
Charity number: 293074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir James Rufus McDonald FREng FRSE | Chair | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Taylor CBE FREng | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dame Dawn Elizabeth Childs DBE FREng | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SARAH HAINSWORTH OBE FRENG | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Denton FREng | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Enass Abo-Hamed | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Victoria Atkinson CBE FREng | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Jonathan Parker CBE FREng | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Eyton CBE FREng | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nilay Shah OBE FREng | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bashir M Al-Hashimi CBE FREng | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Schmolke FREng | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carolyn Jane Griffiths FREng | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Moir Guthrie OBE FREng | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dame Sue Gray CB FREng | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.