FRED THURGOOD TRUST
Charity Number: 293171
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Total income: £456
Total expenditure: £259
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 December 1985: Standard registration
- 11 February 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101 | £127 | £135 | £238 | £456 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £205 | £80 | £259 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 02 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 12 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 23 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT IPSWICH DISTRICT PROBATE REGISTRY ON 16TH MAY 1985
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, TERLING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, TERLING, ESSEX
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window