FARNINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall run for the benefit of the village - i.e. Weddings, Meetings, Parties, Amateur Dramatics, Clubs & Church hire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £830 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 08 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIVIENNE PARKER | Chair | 01 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Carol Salmon | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Daryl Burns | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mick Turpin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Terry Payne | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.88k | £30.85k | £20.39k | £24.72k | £22.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.30k | £13.02k | £18.93k | £16.76k | £26.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £761 | £830 | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £17.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF ARRANGEMENT OF 27TH SEPTEMBER 1938
Charitable objects
THE HALL SHALL BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES AND RECREATIONS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FARNINGHAM IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF FARNINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farningham Village Hall
High Street
Farningham
Dartford
DA4 0DH
- Phone:
- 01322 862330
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window