Accounts and annual returns MEOPHAM SPORTS AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 293310
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 29 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 220 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 91 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 03 December 2019 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 03 December 2019 | 156 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window