MEOPHAM SPORTS AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293310
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £421.66k £407.19k £410.95k £410.95k £392.96k
Total expenditure £460.95k £404.80k £395.57k £379.63k £390.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A