THE LISS AREA HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 293391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the study and recording of the history of the area in all its aspects; to foster interest in research;to publish from time to time findings of the Society; to maintain, preserve and develop the "Liss Collection" and to use it (with any borrowed artefacts) for displays and exhibitions for educational purposes and/or the interest of the public. To develop greater accessibility by public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,348
Total expenditure: £2,962

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nichola Court Chair 01 January 2021
None on record
Rebecca Louise Goode Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
Sue Hampton Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
ANNETTE DAWN CHAMBERS Trustee 20 February 2014
None on record
RON MCCANN Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record
MR JIM STRATTON Trustee
None on record
MRS PENNY BRIGGS Trustee
None on record
JOY CHRISTINA MARTIN Trustee
None on record
MS JUDY HAYES Trustee
None on record
SHARON DENISE STRATTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.96k £1.74k £5.30k £3.84k £3.35k
Total expenditure £3.11k £2.04k £3.21k £3.80k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Lower Heyshott
PETERSFIELD
GU31 4PZ
Phone:
01730261146
Website:

lissareahistorical.co.uk