Financial history THE HONEYWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 293402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £13.75k £14.29k £15.31k £14.85k £11.86k
Total expenditure £18.46k £18.44k £16.71k £20.88k £15.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A