SURREY DRUG AND ALCOHOL CARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Surrey Drug and Alcohol Care (SDAC) comprises of a group of volunteers who provide a 24 hour helpline, 365 days per year giving advice and support to drug and alcohol users and their significant others. Our outreach team provide education talks into schools, colleges and to professional groups. Also managed is a telephone counselling service using contracted professional counsellors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 March 1986: Standard registration
- 06 November 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1151494 SURREY DRUG AND ALCOHOL CARE LIMITED
- GUILDFORD DRUG CARE (Previous name)
- SURREY DRUG CARE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.12k | £80.82k | £98.68k | £101.81k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.96k | £67.76k | £96.76k | £107.83k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 February 2013 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 14 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/1986 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/1989 AND 31/10/2009 AND 13/11/2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ORGANIZATION SHALL BE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS PARTICULARLY AMONGST PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE ORGANIZATION THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: (I) TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO SUBSTANCE MISUSERS AND THEIR RELATIVES AND TO THOSE CLOSELY CONCERNED WITH SUBSTANCE MISUSERS; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE HARMFUL EFFECTS OF DRUGS AND ALCOHOL AMONGST YOUNG STUDENTS ENGAGED IN FULL TIME EDUCATION IN SURREY AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION ON HOW TO ENGAGE WITH LOCAL NHS SERVICES. (III) TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE FOR INTERESTED PROFESSIONALS; (IV) TO COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING SUBSTANCE MISUSE PARTICULARLY WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTING SUBSTANCE MISUSE BY IDENTIFYING THOSE MOST VULNERABLE; (V) TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION AND OTHERWISE PROVIDED THAT THE ORGANIZATION SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTS; (VI) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANIZATION.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD AND WEST SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window