Accounts and annual returns CHRIST THE SAVIOUR

Charity number: 293472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window