Financial history CHRIST THE SAVIOUR

Charity number: 293472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.08k £61.57k £77.41k £71.58k £74.64k
Total expenditure £44.32k £28.54k £52.20k £35.25k £29.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £16.43k