E L M V SHADWELL BASIN PROJECT

Charity number: 293475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £299.14k £389.37k £300.04k £342.88k £293.72k
Total expenditure £345.26k £377.00k £319.85k £367.30k £324.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £27.69k £5.00k £4.17k £21.92k