CLEEVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a Recreation/Community Hall for Village activities, functions etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
Governance
- 15 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK NICHOLAS JOHN BENNETT | Chair | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Florence Elizabeth Hagger | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Joyce | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mary Wooster | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harold Squire | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN WITHYMAN | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN AUDREY ROE | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Molloy | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDA IVY MORTIMER | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Cook | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE STRINGER | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.96k | £44.11k | £15.02k | £13.48k | £12.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.05k | £15.08k | £25.72k | £17.72k | £10.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1936
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CLEEVE,AVON(CHARITABLE TRUSTS (VALIDATION) ACT 1954 HAS BEEN APPLIED).
Area of benefit
CLEEVE, AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 MILLIER ROAD
CLEEVE
BRISTOL
BS49 4NL
- Phone:
- 01934834621
- Email:
- dianacook@tinyworld.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window