Financial history THE FAIRGROUND HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 293579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £490.19k £500.25k £446.13k £395.19k £179.69k
Total expenditure £354.67k £420.56k £413.91k £373.34k £145.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £141.80k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £22.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £477.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £344.01k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £76.55k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.25k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A