CELIA HAMMOND ANIMAL TRUST

Charity number: 293787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 30 August 2017 On time Download