CELIA HAMMOND ANIMAL TRUST

Charity number: 293787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £2.71m £2.86m £3.08m £3.83m £3.00m
Total expenditure £2.76m £3.10m £3.15m £3.31m £3.36m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £75.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.23m £1.34m £1.63m £2.46m £1.68m
Income - Other trading activities £69.47k £72.84k £52.40k £30.83k £40.56k
Income - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.37m £1.34m £1.24m £1.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £72.65k £73.24k £63.23k £96.24k £85.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £695.30k £895.70k £941.35k £1.75m £912.18k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.72m £3.06m £3.10m £3.27m £3.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £45.00k £40.05k £47.80k £35.74k £28.14k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £4.50k £5.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0