Jewish Literary Foundation

Charity number: 293800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the Jewish Literary Foundation is to stimulate and encourage the reading of books on every aspect of Jewish thought, life, literature and history and culture.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £374,968
Total expenditure: £473,241

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • JEWISH BOOK WEEK (Working name)
  • JEWISH BOOK COUNCIL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTONY GROSSMAN Chair 04 June 2018
None on record
Dr Alexander Gordon Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Paul Israel Trustee 05 October 2019
THE MANOR HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
Robin Hilton Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
Stephanie Marcus Trustee 29 September 2014
None on record
Anne Webber Trustee 01 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £291.04k £291.04k £380.84k £309.15k £374.97k
Total expenditure £255.81k £255.81k £326.81k £378.97k £473.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 08 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Azets Holdings Ltd
River House
1 Maidstone Road
SIDCUP
Kent
DA14 5RH
Phone:
02072845910