Financial history THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS

Charity number: 293851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.45m £23.35m £72.31m £74.60m £76.69m
Total expenditure £63.00m £17.32m £65.02m £68.27m £66.84m
Income from government contracts £0 £3.02m £3.72m £3.09m £2.41m
Income from government grants £2.52m £0 N/A £510.95k £304.43k
Income - Donations and legacies £23.00k £19.00k £2.77m £471.00k £9.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.59m £1.73m £1.85m £1.98m £1.66m
Income - Charitable activities £65.43m £63.24m £67.14m £71.65m £74.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £412.00k £840.00k £551.00k £497.00k £220.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £106.00k
Income - Legacies £23.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £62.65m £58.03m £63.03m £67.29m £65.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £63.00k £173.00k £134.00k £71.00k £64.00k
Expenditure - Governance £6.98m £0 £8.11m £10.83m £10.75m
Expenditure - Grants institution £85.00k £76.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £287.00k £951.00k £1.86m £911.00k £1.21m